Date of birth/Age: | Jun 9, 1973 (50) |
---|---|
Place of Birth: | Werneck |
Citizenship: | Germany |
Avg. term as coach: |
1.04 Years |
Coaching Licence: | UEFA Pro Licence |
Preferred formation: | 4-2-3-1 |
Christian Wück
IMAGO
- Date of birth/Age: Jun 9, 1973 (50)
- Place of birth: Werneck
- Citizenship: Germany
- Coaching Licence : UEFA Pro Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 1.04 Years
- Preferred formation : 4-2-3-1
Former player:
Last club :
Arm. Bielefeld
Retired :
Jul 1, 2002
Personal Details
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Women's footbal Manager | 24/25 (Sep 1, 2024) | expected - | - | 0.00 | ||
Germany U17 Manager | 23/24 (Nov 1, 2023) | 23/24 (Dec 3, 2023) | 7 | 3.00 | ||
Germany U15 Manager | 23/24 (Jul 1, 2023) | 23/24 (Jul 31, 2024) | - | 0.00 | ||
Germany U17 Manager | 22/23 (Jul 1, 2022) | 22/23 (Jun 30, 2023) | 22 | 1.82 | ||
Germany U16 Manager | 21/22 (Jul 1, 2021) | 21/22 (Jun 30, 2022) | 12 | 1.33 | ||
Germany U15 Manager | 20/21 (Jul 1, 2020) | 20/21 (Jun 30, 2021) | - | 0.00 | ||
Germany U17 Manager | 19/20 (Jul 1, 2019) | 19/20 (Jun 30, 2020) | 11 | 1.82 | ||
Germany U16 Manager | 18/19 (Jul 1, 2018) | 18/19 (Jun 30, 2019) | 12 | 1.50 | ||
Germany U15 Manager | 17/18 (Jul 1, 2017) | 17/18 (Jun 30, 2018) | 2 | 0.00 | ||
Germany U17 Manager | 16/17 (Jul 1, 2016) | 16/17 (Jun 30, 2017) | 19 | 2.16 | ||
Germany U17 Manager | 15/16 (Oct 9, 2015) | 15/16 (Oct 29, 2015) | 4 | 1.50 | ||
Germany U16 Manager | 15/16 (Jul 1, 2015) | 15/16 (Jun 30, 2016) | 10 | 2.20 | ||
Germany U17 Manager | 13/14 (Jul 1, 2013) | 14/15 (Jun 30, 2015) | 36 | 1.83 | ||
Germany U16 Manager | 12/13 (Aug 17, 2012) | 12/13 (Jun 30, 2013) | 17 | 1.53 | ||
Holstein Kiel Manager | 09/10 (Oct 6, 2009) | 09/10 (Jun 30, 2010) | 26 | 0.96 | ||
Rot Weiss Ahlen Manager | 07/08 (Jul 1, 2007) | 08/09 (Mar 3, 2009) | 60 | 1.58 | ||
Rot Weiss Ahlen Assistant Manager | 06/07 (Jan 1, 2007) | 06/07 (Jun 30, 2007) | - | 0.00 | ||
Assistant Manager of: Heiko Bonan (16 Games) | ||||||
Enger-Westeren. Manager | 04/05 (Dec 1, 2004) | 06/07 (Dec 31, 2006) | - | 0.00 | ||
A. Bielefeld II Assistant Manager | 02/03 (Jul 1, 2002) | 02/03 (Jun 30, 2003) | - | 0.00 | ||
Assistant Manager of: Jürgen Prüfer (34 Games) |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
Season | Date | Left | Joined | MV | Fee | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/03 | Jul 1, 2002 | Arm. Bielefeld | Retired | - | - | |||||
00/01 | Jul 1, 2000 | VfL Wolfsburg | Arm. Bielefeld | - | free transfer | |||||
99/00 | Jul 1, 1999 | Karlsruher SC | VfL Wolfsburg | - | free transfer | |||||
94/95 | Jul 1, 1994 | 1.FC Nuremberg | Karlsruher SC | - | €900k | |||||
90/91 | Jul 1, 1990 | Nürnberg U19 | 1.FC Nuremberg | - | - | |||||
87/88 | Jan 1, 1988 | Schweinfurt U19 | Nürnberg U19 | - | ? | |||||
Total transfer fees: | €900k |